ads slot

Kerala PSC - Maths Shortcut Tricks (Multiplication) - 3


In our previous tutorial we have learnt shortcut for multiplying any number with 111 without using a pen or pencil or even writing on paper. In this tutorial we will try to learn how to multiply teens with teens (11 x 12, 12 x 13.....19).

Lets start with multiplying 12 x 13 = ?


First step add 12 + 3 = 15
Second step Multiply 2 x 3 = 6
∴ 12 x 13 = 156


Lets Multiply 13 x 14 = ?


First step add 13 + 4 = 17
Second step Multiply 3 x 4 = 12
Balance it ∴ 13 x 14 = 182


Multiply 19 x 17 = ?


First step add 19 + 7 = 26
Second step Multiply 9 x 7 = 63
Balance it ∴ 19 x 17 = 323


Multiply 19 x 19 = ?


First step add 19 + 9 = 28
Second step Multiply 9 x 9 = 81
Balance it ∴ 19 x 17 = 361

Share on Google Plus

About Kerala Boys

This is Kerala Boys new KERALAPSCGK.COM which is an exam preparation platform that provides you unlimited practice options, online tests along with conceptual content, developed and designed by Santhosh Nair