ads slot

Kerala PSC - Maths Shortcut Tricks (Multiplication)

Kerala PSC - Shortcut Tricks (Multiplication)

In this tutorial we will try to learn a simple but effective shortcut technique for multiplying any number with 11 without using a pen or pencil or evening writing on paper.
Lets first start with any no. multiplied by 11.

3152 x 11 = ?

The first digit and last digit of the answer will remain constant 3 and 2.

Just keep adding the consecutive No.s

3152 x 11 = 34672


Some Examples

Example:1
53241 x 11 = ?
First Digit 5 as it is
5+3 = 8
3+2 = 5
2+4 = 6
4+1 = 5
Last Digit 1 as it is
∴ 53241 x 11 = 585651

Example:2
26134 x 11 = ?
First Digit 2 as it is
2+6 = 8
6+1 = 7
1+3 = 4
3+4 = 7
Last Digit 4 as it is
∴ 26134 x 11 = 287474


Example:3
23586 x 11 = ?
First Digit 2 as it is
5+3 = 5
3+2 = 8
2+4 = 13
4+1 = 14
Last Digit 6 as it is
Now apply balancing rule
∴ 23586 x 11 = 259446

Example:4
38429 x 11 = ?
First Digit 3 as it is
2+6 = 11
6+1 = 12
1+3 = 6
3+4 = 11
Last Digit 9 as it is
Now apply balancing rule
∴ 38429 x 11 = 422719


Let try this trick on a bigger number : -

6274598712 x 11 = ?
6274598712 x 11 = 69020585832



MULTIPLY A NUMBER WITH 111
Share on Google Plus

About Kerala Boys

This is Kerala Boys new KERALAPSCGK.COM which is an exam preparation platform that provides you unlimited practice options, online tests along with conceptual content, developed and designed by Santhosh Nair